Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmahan'S Furnitur, E, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Manibog, Grace, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Janene Beronio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanene Beronio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: Dismissing case for delay in prosecution | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APP ORDER DISMISSING SIGNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: FROM DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS AS UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
January 20, 2000 | Docket Event |
*Review PRO TEM: BLAINE JUCHAU CLERK: B. HARPER PLAINTIFF: NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT: NOT PRESENT DROPPED FROM CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE COURT Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 20, 2000 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: AT REQUEST OF: COURT |
|
January 20, 2000 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
October 21, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Review YOLANDE AVELOS S&T FOR PLNT DEFT GRACI MANIBOG NOT PRESENT CONTINUED TO/FOR: 1-20-00 AT 8:30 FOR REV Judge: Beronio, Janene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.