Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
C B Keeling Transp, Ortation, Ramos Oil Company,, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Keeling, Cornelius B, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: Delay in Prosecution | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APP MOTION GRANTED CASE DISM W/ PREJ Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-SC-98000315(SC1) | |
September 03, 1998 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court P ATTNY: PRO PER Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
July 02, 1998 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
May 29, 1998 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET UNCLMD Notes: REASON: NO SUCH STREET. |
|
May 22, 1998 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERT #P 595 161 238 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.