Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Compact Disc Resea, University Of Cali, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Johnston, Raymond Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Janene Beronio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanene Beronio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT HEARING Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case 'RDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RAYMOND JOSEPH JOHNSTON ON 2-9-06 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $46.00 |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: PER VANESSA AT CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES, CHANGE DEF'S ADDRESS TO: 407 G STREET APT 1, DAVIS, CA 95616. |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Application OEX SM CL APP/ORD FOR OX |
|
January 31, 2003 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Judge, Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.