Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amos, Patricia E, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Woolley, Kenneth D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* | |
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURNED FROM PLAINTIFF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-SC-98000181(SC1) | |
May 14, 1998 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court P ATTNY: PRO PER Judge: Judge, Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.