Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woodard Homes, Reid, Floyd M, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Woodard, Walt, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 1997 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO PARTIES PRESENT CASE TO BE DISM W/ PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: DEF AS UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: PETITIONER AS UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-SC-97000899(SC1) | |
February 19, 1998 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
December 03, 1997 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERT #P 595 160 994 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.