Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ddc Foodservice, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with O'Mara, J Kent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeO'Mara, J Kent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2012 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEF JOE PEREZ PRESENT DEF TO CONT MAKING PAYMENTS TO PLTF ORDER TO DISMISS IS DENIED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion - Denied DENIED* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Denied ORD DENYING* Notes: MOTION TO DISMISS DENIED; DEFENDANT IS STILL MAKING PAYMENTS TO PALINTIF UNDER THE MEDIATION AGREEMENT SIGNED ON 7/28/94 |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURNED FROM PLAINTIFF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADDED TO SYSTEM* Notes: MANUALLY FROM PSI/CD-ROM/PAPER DOCKETS |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.