Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paul Martinez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Yolanda Martinez, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Edmund L. Montgomery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdmund L. Montgomery Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2001 |
CategoryDissolution No Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions610 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time834 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COURT CLERK SIGN THE INTERSPOUSAL TRANSFER DEED FILED BY PAUL MARTINEZ. - Minutes Pre-D Complete M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER SOPHIA WISE 12008 BAILIFF: L SCOTT - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PAUL MARTINEZ RESPONDENT YOLANDA MARTINEZ PRESENT ATTORNEY EDMUND MONTGOMERY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: MATTER HAS BEEN RESOLVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: M J TORCHIA |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF COURT HEARING FILED BY PAUL MARTINEZ. Not Applicable |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF COURT HEARING BY MAIL ON 04/05/12 AS TO YOLANDA ROMERO, FILED. Not Applicable |
|
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COURT CLERK SIGN THE INTERSPOUSAL TRANSFER DEED FILED BY PAUL MARTINEZ. - Minutes Pre-D Complete MINUTES UPDATED BY CARNESHA BULLOCKS - M J TORCHIA, JUDGE CLERK: MAYRA PANAMENO NOT REPORTED BAILIFF: L SCOTT - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY EDMUND L MONTGOMERY OFFICE (TELEPHONIC) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PETITIONERS COUNSEL. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/24/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S10. COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: MINUTES UPDATED BY CARNESHA BULLOCKS |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC WITH APPLICATION FOR ORDER AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: COURT CLERK SIGN THE INTERSPOUSAL TRANSFER DEED FILED BY PAUL MARTINEZ. Not Applicable |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S10 | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM DM TO DMN Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.