Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marquez, Alicia Gallegos, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marquez, Phillip V., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Loo, Cynthia L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoo, Cynthia L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Time To Trial1059 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1134 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1134 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs COURT TRIAL RE: 401K CONT'D FROM 4/06/18, 6/07/18, 8/03/18, 9/18/18, 11/30/18, 2/07/19, 3/07/19, 05/10/19, 7/17/19, 9/26/19 12/05/19 6/09/20 9/18/20 11/17/20, 01/20/21, 04/21/21, 07/29/21 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs COURT TRIAL RE: 401K CONT'D FROM 4/06/18, 6/07/18, 8/03/18, 9/18/18, 11/30/18, 2/07/19, 3/07/19, 05/10/19, 7/17/19, 9/26/19 12/05/19 6/09/20 9/18/20 11/17/20, 01/20/21, 04/21/21, 07/29/21 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
October 25, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Reassignment from Judge Webster to Commissioner | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs COURT TRIAL RE: 401K CONT'D FROM 4/06/18, 6/07/18, 8/03/18, 9/18/18, 11/30/18, 2/07/19, 3/07/19, 7/17/19, 9/26/19 12/05/19 6/09/20 9/18/20 11/17/20, 01/20/21, 04/21/21 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs COURT TRIAL RE: 401K CONT'D FROM 4/06/18, 6/07/18, 8/03/18, 9/18/18, 11/30/18, 2/07/19, 3/07/19, 7/17/19, 9/26/19 12/05/19 6/09/20 9/18/20 11/17/20, 01/20/21, 04/21/21 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
May 06, 2021 | Hearing | Mail Returned Undelivered | |
April 21, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
April 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs COURT TRIAL RE: 401K CONT'D FROM 4/06/18, 6/07/18, 8/03/18, 9/18/18, 11/30/18, 2/07/19, 3/07/19, 7/17/19, 9/26/19 12/05/19 6/09/20 9/18/20 11/17/20, 01/20/21 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs COURT TRIAL RE: 401K CONT'D FROM 4/06/18, 6/07/18, 8/03/18, 9/18/18, 11/30/18, 2/07/19, 3/07/19, 7/17/19, 9/26/19 12/05/19 6/09/20 9/18/20 11/17/20, 01/20/21 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.