Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kay, Laura M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kay, Richard J., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Somers, John S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSomers, John S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1284 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1284 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted Records Destroyed - Kern High School District, dtd 4/4/2014. |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Subpoenaed /records check in / check out with disposed records per notice |
|
June 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Subpoenaed /records check in / check out with disposed records per notice |
|
June 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted Records Destroyed - Kern High School District, dtd 4/4/2014. |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) RE: SET ASIDE FINANCIAL PROVISIONS OF JGMT - 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/10/2016 SPEC. SET @ 8:30 IN DEPT. 1 Judge: Grove, Mary |
|
June 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) RE: SET ASIDE FINANCIAL PROVISIONS OF JGMT - 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/10/2016 SPEC. SET @ 8:30 IN DEPT. 1 Judge: Grove, Mary |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM SET ASIDE FINANCIAL PROVISIONS OF JUDGMENT 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 8/31/15 CONT'D FROM 10/05/15 CONT'D FROM 11/16/15 CONT'D FROM 01/19/16 CONT'D FROM 03/15/16 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
May 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM SET ASIDE FINANCIAL PROVISIONS OF JUDGMENT 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 8/31/15 CONT'D FROM 10/05/15 CONT'D FROM 11/16/15 CONT'D FROM 01/19/16 CONT'D FROM 03/15/16 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Hearing |
DCSS: Stipulation to Continue and Order Thereon
Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM SET ASIDE FINANCIAL PROVISIONS OF JUDGMENT 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 8/31/15 CONT'D FROM 10/05/15 CONT'D FROM 11/16/15 CONT'D FROM 01/19/16 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.