Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moorehead, Tracey L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moorehead, Marco, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions321 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time471 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney BENJAMIN GREENE WITHDRAWS FOR PETITIONER |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney BENJAMIN GREENE WITHDRAWS FOR PETITIONER |
|
April 15, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY TO BENJAMIN GREENE: DATE ON #2 INCORRECT |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY TO BENJAMIN GREENE: DATE ON #2 INCORRECT |
|
December 02, 2009 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
November 17, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
November 17, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 11/17/09 JUDGE: FIELDER |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 11/17/09 JUDGE: FIELDER |
|
November 05, 2009 | Hearing | Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
October 01, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1060 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: SLAV KASRELIOVICH MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR BENJAMIN R GREENE ESQ ON BEHALF OF TRACEY L MOOREHEAD (PE-1). MARCO MOOREHEAD (RE-1) APPEARS WITH BRUCE E SOUTH. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. SPOUSAL SUPPORT TERMINATED AS TO BOTH PARTIES. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. FURNITURE, FURNISHINGS, PROPERTY ALL ALREADY DIVIDED. PARTAIES WAIVE EQUAL DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS. PARTIES WAIVE WATTS/EPSTEIN CREDITS. PARTIES WAIVE FC 2641 CREDITS. VEHICLES ARE DIVIDED AS RECITED ON THE RECORD. DEBTS ARE DIVIDED AS RECITED ON THE RECORD. ANY BENEFITS THROUGH THE UNION AND THE OPERHEIM FUND IS AWARDED TO RESPONDENT AS HE SOLE AND SEPARATE PROPERTY. REAL PROPERTY AS RECITED ON THE RECORD. *************************************************************************************** PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT FINDS THAT IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES HAVE ARISEN LEADING TO THE IRREMEDIABLE BREAKDOWN OF THE MARRIAGE. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. WIFE'S FORMER NAME RESTORED: RAMIREZ RESPONDENT TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.