Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Vickers, Diana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vickers, James, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Raymonda B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
DCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 14, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: January 28, 2021Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: July 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs ON DISSOLUTION T/E: 3 HOURS (DAY 2 OF 2) |
|
July 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs ON DISSOLUTION T/E: 3 HOURS (DAY 2 OF 2) Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
July 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs ON DISSOLUTION T/E: 3 HOURS (DAY 1 OF 2) |
|
July 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs ON DISSOLUTION T/E: 3 HOURS (DAY 1 OF 2) Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Status Conference STATUS & READINESS FOR TRIAL |
|
June 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference STATUS & READINESS FOR TRIAL Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Family Law Tentative Setting 03/28/24 PET/ATTY. XOCHITL GARCIA MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL |
|
May 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Family Law Tentative Setting 03/28/24 PET/ATTY. XOCHITL GARCIA MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner 03/21/2024 PET ENDORSE INSURANCE CHECKS, SEND INSURANCE CHECK TO MORTGAGE HOLDER, OPEN BLOCKED INTEREST BEARING TRUST ACCOUNT, BOTH PARTIES TO COMPLETE/SIGN A W-9 FORM, DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS, RES PAY ATTY FEES, STATEMENT OF DECISION |
|
April 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner 03/21/2024 PET ENDORSE INSURANCE CHECKS, SEND INSURANCE CHECK TO MORTGAGE HOLDER, OPEN BLOCKED INTEREST BEARING TRUST ACCOUNT, BOTH PARTIES TO COMPLETE/SIGN A W-9 FORM, DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS, RES PAY ATTY FEES, STATEMENT OF DECISION Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.