Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vidales, Livier, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vidales, Luis Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Susan M. Gill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan M. Gill Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions251 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time662 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2010 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order S/S SM GILL |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order S/S SM GILL |
|
May 20, 2010 | Hearing |
172E Pmt: Family Law Motion-No Hearing GC 70677(C) Amount of $20.00 for VIDALES, LIVIER (PE-1). Received from LIVIER VIDALES. Receipt #524442 for amount of $20.00. |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
172E Pmt: Family Law Motion-No Hearing GC 70677(C) Amount of $20.00 for VIDALES, LIVIER (PE-1). Received from LIVIER VIDALES. Receipt #524442 for amount of $20.00. |
|
April 30, 2010 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RE: INTERSPOUSAL TRANSFER DEED JUDGE: SUSAN M GILL |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order RE: INTERSPOUSAL TRANSFER DEED JUDGE: SUSAN M GILL |
|
April 29, 2010 | Hearing |
172E Pmt: Family Law Motion-No Hearing GC 70677(C) Amount of $20.00 for VIDALES LIVIER (PE-1). Received from LLIVIER VIDALES, check no(s) 3556547. Receipt #520835 for amount of $20.00. |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
172E Pmt: Family Law Motion-No Hearing GC 70677(C) Amount of $20.00 for VIDALES LIVIER (PE-1). Received from LLIVIER VIDALES, check no(s) 3556547. Receipt #520835 for amount of $20.00. |
|
April 08, 2009 | Hearing | Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU | |
April 08, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.