Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Trevino, Armando, Meza, Antonio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Meza, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Benavides, Jose R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenavides, Jose R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryLegal Separation Without Minor Children |
Time To Trial1138 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1174 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1909 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2013 | Hearing | Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted | |
November 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: filed by Ira StokerRESP TO CORRECT RULING ON EQUALIZATION PAYMENT filed by Ira StokerRESP TO CORRECT RULING ON EQUALIZATION PAYMENT Judge: Compton, James L. |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: filed by Ira StokerRESP TO CORRECT RULING ON EQUALIZATION PAYMENT filed by Ira StokerRESP TO CORRECT RULING ON EQUALIZATION PAYMENT Judge: Compton, James L. |
|
September 21, 2012 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered 08/17/12 MINUTE ORDER |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered 08/17/12 MINUTE ORDER |
|
September 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders CT DATE 8/13/2012 SMG |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders CT DATE 8/13/2012 SMG |
|
August 21, 2012 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders CT DATE 6/14/2012 JLC |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders CT DATE 6/14/2012 JLC |
|
August 17, 2012 | Hearing |
NP1820 Department: D Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: The parties agreed that the total amount of money taken by the respondent $334,695, which included the tax returns of $51,073 and $18,237, when the tax returns were listed again it amounted to a double charge. There should have been a total community equity of $1,048,178 with the petitioner receiving $419,685 and the respondent receiving $628,494. This would leave an equalization payment of $104,404.50 payable from respondent to petitioner to equalize, which is to be paid from the amount being held in escrow. The amounts remaining in escrow would be to the respondent as part of her division of the community property sale. THE DECISION IS MAILED TO ANTONIO MEZA AND THE LAW OFFICE OF IRA STOKER. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.