Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Armendariz, Martha E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Armendariz, Jose A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions408 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time478 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2009 | Hearing |
Wage & Earnings Assignment Order RESPONDENT ORDERED TO PAY 250.00 PER MONTH S/S 125.00 PER MONTH S/S ARREARS TOTAL 375.00 PER MONTH |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Wage & Earnings Assignment Order RESPONDENT ORDERED TO PAY 250.00 PER MONTH S/S 125.00 PER MONTH S/S ARREARS TOTAL 375.00 PER MONTH |
|
October 30, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice WAGE ASSIGNMENT SENT BACK TO BENJAMIN GREENES OFFICE. # 9 INCOMPLETE |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice WAGE ASSIGNMENT SENT BACK TO BENJAMIN GREENES OFFICE. # 9 INCOMPLETE |
|
October 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney THOMAS W. CASA WITHDRAWALS |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney THOMAS W. CASA WITHDRAWALS |
|
September 29, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL SENT BACK AMS TO BENJAMIN GREENE'S OFFICE # 2 DATE INCORRECT |
|
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL SENT BACK AMS TO BENJAMIN GREENE'S OFFICE # 2 DATE INCORRECT |
|
September 24, 2009 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
September 11, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.