Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Green, Rhonda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roy, Jason Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Susan M. Gill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan M. Gill Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions632 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3599 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order CUSTODY AND VISITATION Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order CUSTODY AND VISITATION Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
November 15, 2017 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
August 30, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
August 04, 2010 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
July 27, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL #2 INCORRECT DATE OF JUDGEMENT AND INCORRECT CASE # |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL #2 INCORRECT DATE OF JUDGEMENT AND INCORRECT CASE # |
|
May 18, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
April 15, 2010 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution MARITAL STATUS ENDS 04/15/10 JUDGE JD OGLESBY |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution MARITAL STATUS ENDS 04/15/10 JUDGE JD OGLESBY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.