Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Manning, Brandi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manning, Vance Alan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGill, Susan M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 05/06/20 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 06/16/20, 07/14/20 08/20/20 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 05/06/20 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 06/16/20, 07/14/20 08/20/20 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
November 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders RE PROCEEDINGS OF 9/29/2020 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders RE PROCEEDINGS OF 9/29/2020 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 05/06/20 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 06/16/20, 07/14/20 08/20/20 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 05/06/20 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 06/16/20, 07/14/20 08/20/20 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
August 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 05/06/20 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 06/16/20, 07/14/20 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 05/06/20 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 06/16/20, 07/14/20 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
July 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING 6/16/2020 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING 6/16/2020 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.