Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sutton, Maria J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sutton, Everett L., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGill, Susan M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2540 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 6/25/15- FILED BY DCSS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 6/25/15- FILED BY DCSS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STD ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STD ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
May 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD C/S H/C Hearing Date: 06/25/15 Hearing Time: 8:00A Hearing Department/Division: A FILED BY DCSS |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD C/S H/C Hearing Date: 06/25/15 Hearing Time: 8:00A Hearing Department/Division: A FILED BY DCSS |
|
May 21, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice REJECTED NOM FILED BY DCSS |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice REJECTED NOM FILED BY DCSS |
|
April 30, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice REJECTED NOM FILED BY DCSS |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice REJECTED NOM FILED BY DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.