Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fernandez, Heidi M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fernandez, Jesus F, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGill, Susan M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Time To Trial225 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions298 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time4424 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice 30 Day Notice of disposition of exhibits mailed to DCSS |
|
August 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Order Destr / Disp Exh / Depositions
Judge: Dulcich, Judith K. |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice 30 Day Notice of disposition of exhibits mailed to DCSS |
|
July 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys E-FILED Substitution of Attorney |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys E-FILED Substitution of Attorney |
|
April 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING: 3/21/17 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING: 3/21/17 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
March 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner PET C/C C/V MOVE AWAY 2 MINORS Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner PET C/C C/V MOVE AWAY 2 MINORS Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
March 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY MOTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.