Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carter, Prevella Veronica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carter, Ernest Roosevelt, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions180 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2008 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
December 29, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 01/23/2009 JUDGE SOMERS C.C.P. 635 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 01/23/2009 JUDGE SOMERS C.C.P. 635 |
|
December 23, 2008 | Hearing | Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
December 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT SENT BACK VIA/MAIL MISSING FINAL DISCLOSURES FOR RESP |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT SENT BACK VIA/MAIL MISSING FINAL DISCLOSURES FOR RESP |
|
November 06, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1060 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PREVELLA VERONICA CARTER (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ERNEST ROOSEVELT CARTER JR (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: TRIAL IS ADVANCED TO TODAY. PARTIES HAVE AN AGREEMENT. PARTIES WAIVE EQUAL DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT FINDS THAT IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES HAVE ARISEN LEADING TO THE IRREMEDIABLE BREAKDOWN OF THE MARRIAGE. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. WIFE'S FORMER NAME RESTORED: PREVELLA VERONICA HOWARD. PETITIONER TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
November 06, 2008 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
November 06, 2008 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 1 HOUR EST Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference 1 HOUR EST Judge: Fielder, John L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.