Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arvizu, Gilbert Farelas, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Arvizu, Gilbert Romero, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2008 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Cause Dropped NO APPEARANCES NOR SERVICE |
|
August 25, 2008 | Hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
August 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause PET DV 1ST REISSUANCE FROM 07⁄21⁄2008 NO SERVICE Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Cause Dropped NO APPEARANCES NOR SERVICE |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause PET DV 1ST REISSUANCE FROM 07⁄21⁄2008 NO SERVICE Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
July 22, 2008 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for 1ST REISSUANCE DV/TRO CLETS FAXED TO KCSO |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for 1ST REISSUANCE DV/TRO CLETS FAXED TO KCSO |
|
July 21, 2008 | Hearing |
Application and Order for Reissuance of Order to Show Cause/ LAST HEARING SET FOR: 07/21/2008 REISSUED 0 TIMES NEW HEARING : 08/25/2008 8:30AM D-C |
|
July 21, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1105 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER OR RESPONDENT AT THE TIME OF HEARING THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THERE HAVING BEEN NO SERVICE AND NO APPEARANCE BY THE PARTIES THE MATTER IS DROPPED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.