Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Burgess, Bonnie Lynn, Burgess, Rhonda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Burgess, Ronnie Gene, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1103 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
140A: Pmt: Record Search Exceeding 10 Min GC 70627(C) Amount of $15.00 for BURGESS RONNIE GENE (RE-1). Received from WILLIAM MEANS. Receipt #832778 for amount of $15.00. |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
140A: Pmt: Record Search Exceeding 10 Min GC 70627(C) Amount of $15.00 for BURGESS RONNIE GENE (RE-1). Received from WILLIAM MEANS. Receipt #832778 for amount of $15.00. |
|
July 10, 2014 | Hearing |
182B Pmt: Certified Copy of Dissolution GC 70674 EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for BURGESS BONNIE LYNN (PE-1). Received from BONNIE BURGESS. Receipt #787491 for amount of $15.00. |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
182B Pmt: Certified Copy of Dissolution GC 70674 EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for BURGESS BONNIE LYNN (PE-1). Received from BONNIE BURGESS. Receipt #787491 for amount of $15.00. |
|
October 20, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ATTY MICHAEL CARLOVSKY WITHDRAWS |
|
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ATTY MICHAEL CARLOVSKY WITHDRAWS |
|
August 26, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FILED ON 8/26/11 BUT SIGNED 4/5/11 |
|
August 26, 2011 | Hearing | Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FILED ON 8/26/11 BUT SIGNED 4/5/11 |
|
August 02, 2011 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order PROTECTIVE ORDER PRO TEMP KCC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.