Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wang, Qun, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lee, John K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time87 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2008 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
June 23, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STAUTS ENDS: 10/4/08 COMMISSIONER GIANQUINTO |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STAUTS ENDS: 10/4/08 COMMISSIONER GIANQUINTO |
|
June 18, 2008 | Hearing | Judgm/Disso By Decl Granted | |
June 16, 2008 | Hearing | Declaration for Default | |
June 16, 2008 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
June 16, 2008 | Hearing | Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure | |
June 03, 2008 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: JASON J. LEE NEW ATTORNEY: SELF |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: JASON J. LEE NEW ATTORNEY: SELF |
|
April 30, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1040 Department: B Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: INJUNCTIVE ORDER. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: QUN WANG (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT AND THE PETITIONER'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, JASON LEE. PETITIONER INFORMS THE COURT THAT HER RETAINED COUNSEL WILL BE FILING A SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND REQUESTS FOR MOTION TO BE DROPPED. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MATTER DROPPED AT THE PETITIONER'S REQUEST. PETITIONER IS REFERRED TO THE FAMILY LAW FACILITATOR'S OFFICE FOR ASSISTANCE IN PROCEEDING WITH THE DIVORCE ACTION. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.