Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Clark, Roger D, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Clark, Kristen A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Benavides, Jose R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenavides, Jose R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions778 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2220 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney PET: ANTHONY P. AZEMIKA WITHDRAWING |
|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney PET: ANTHONY P. AZEMIKA WITHDRAWING |
|
March 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Proof of Service PET : POS BY MAIL |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PET : POS BY MAIL |
|
March 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders CT DATE 1/22/2014 JLC |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders CT DATE 1/22/2014 JLC |
|
January 22, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1045A Department: D Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFY CUSTODY AND VISITATION. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROGER D CLARK JR (PE-1) APPEARS WITH ANTHONY P AZEMIKA. KRISTEN A CLARK (RE-1) APPEARS WITH GREGORY P FALK. CARL W HART JR APPEARS FOR MINOR CHILD(REN). *************************************************************************************** IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT DOES NOT FIND A SUFFICIENT BASIS TO CHANGE CUSTODY OR THE VISITATION SCHEDULE. RECEIVING PARTY SHALL TRANSPORT FOR VISITATION EXCHANGES. PARTIES SHALL COMMUNICATE VIA EMAIL OR TEXT IF THE CHILDREN'S ACTIVITIES, SCHOOL EVENTS AND MEDICAL/DENTAL APPOINTMENTS WILL EFFECT THEIR CUSTODIAL PERIOD. PARTIES ARE TO KEEP THE OTHER INFORMED OF THE ACTIVITIES, SCHOOL EVENTS AND MEDICAL/DENTAL APPOINTMENTS. THE PARENTS ARE TO MAKE THE DECISIONS REGARDING THE CHILDREN NOT THIRD PARTIES. THE CHILDREN SHALL NOT BE LEFT ALONE WITH THE MATERNAL GRANDFATHER. A THIRD PARTY ADULT, OTHER THAN THE MATERNAL GRANDMOTHER, SHALL BE PRESENT. MR. AZEMIKA TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. MINOR'S COUNSEL TO BE RELIEVED UPON EXECUTION OF ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
January 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Request for Order (Res) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: MOD CC CV |
|
January 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent RE: MOD CC CV Judge: Compton, James L. |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent RE: MOD CC CV Judge: Compton, James L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.