Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Lawless, Keith A, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Lawless, Marisa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Custody |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 19, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 22, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 26, 2023Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner 02/22/24 PET SET ASIDE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER STMNT OF DEC CONT FROM 03/28/24 *PET 1ST CONT* Judge: Moran, Kevin |
|
April 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 1/29/24 RES PROP CNTRL CONTD FROM 03/08/24 *RES 1ST CONT* *RES FL-309 FILED 3/7/24 LISTED THE PARTIES INCORRECTLY* *SERVICE ISSUES* Judge: Moran, Kevin |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 1/29/24 RES PROP CNTRL CONTD FROM 03/08/24 *RES 1ST CONT* *RES FL-309 FILED 3/7/24 LISTED THE PARTIES INCORRECTLY* *SERVICE ISSUES* |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner 02/22/24 PET SET ASIDE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER STMNT OF DEC CONT FROM 03/28/24 *PET 1ST CONT* |
|
April 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306) CORRECTED |
|
April 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RESP DEC PLACED IN FL PRO PER BIN |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306) CORRECTED |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Rejection/Correction Notice RESP DEC PLACED IN FL PRO PER BIN |
|
April 03, 2024 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner 02/22/24 PET SET ASIDE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER STMNT OF DEC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.