Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wood, Denise Lynn, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Wood, Jake Richard, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time53 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2006 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service WHAT SERVED: RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING WHO SERVED: JAKE RICHARD WOOD DATE SERVED: 2/15/2006 |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service WHAT SERVED: RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING WHO SERVED: JAKE RICHARD WOOD DATE SERVED: 2/15/2006 |
|
February 10, 2006 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FAXED TO BPD |
|
February 10, 2006 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDERS EXPIRE: 1/25/2009 |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING FAXED TO BPD |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDERS EXPIRE: 1/25/2009 |
|
January 25, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1105 Department: A Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DENISE LYNN WOOD (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT JAKE RICHARD WOOD. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: RESTRAINING ORDERS AND STAY AWAY ORDERS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: JAKE RICHARD WOOD SHALL NOT HARASS, ATTACK, STRIKE, THREATEN, ASSAULT (SEXUALLY OR OTHERWISE), HIT, FOLLOW, STALK, MOLEST, DESTROY PERSONAL PROPERTY, DISTURB THE PEACE, KEEP UNDER SURVEILLANCE, BLOCK MOVEMENTS, CONTACT (EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY), TELEPHONE, SEND MESSAGES, MAIL OR E-MAIL DENISE LYNN WOOD. JAKE RICHARD WOOD MUST STAY AT LEAST 100 YARDS AWAY FROM DENISE LYNN WOOD, HER HOME, JOB AND CAR. DENISE LYNN WOOD HAS THE RIGHT TO RECORD COMMUNICATIONS MADE TO HER BY JAKE RICHARD WOOD THAT VIOLATE THESE ORDERS. JAKE RICHARD WOOD CANNOT OWN, POSSESS, HAVE, BUY OR TRY TO BUY, RECEIVE OR TRY TO RECEIVE, OR IN ANY OTHER WAY GET A GUN OR FIREARM. JAKE RICHARD WOOD IS TO SELL OR TURN IN ANY GUNS OR FIREARMS THAT HE HAS OR CONTROLS. ORDER IS GOOD FOR THREE YEARS. PETITIONER TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
January 25, 2006 | Hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
January 25, 2006 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause PET DV TRO |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.