Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Macilvaine, Mary Lou, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Macilavine, Joseph C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions756 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1198 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ED QUICK WITHDRAWALS |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ED QUICK WITHDRAWALS |
|
February 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order RE: ROLL GROUP 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN JUDGE STALEY |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order RE: ROLL GROUP 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN JUDGE STALEY |
|
January 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order RE: ROLL GROUP 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN JUDGE STALEY |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order RE: ROLL GROUP 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN JUDGE STALEY |
|
May 10, 2006 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
February 24, 2006 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
January 24, 2006 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
January 24, 2006 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 1/24/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.