Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adam, Thomas Wayne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adam, Lori Rae, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph L. McKnight, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 1997 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2018 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Image of Archived Documents | |
October 23, 2012 | Hearing |
Cause Dropped PER ATTORNEY BRUCE E. SOUTH |
|
October 23, 2012 | Hearing |
4106 Order to Show Cause (Pet) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: ASSIGNED ARREARS - 1 MINORCONTD FROM 8/13/2012 AND 10/9/2012 |
|
October 23, 2012 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Petitioner RE: ASSIGNED ARREARS - 1 MINORCONTD FROM 8/13/2012 AND 10/9/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
4106 Order to Show Cause (Pet) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: ASSIGNED ARREARS - 1 MINORCONTD FROM 8/13/2012 AND 10/9/2012 |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Petitioner RE: ASSIGNED ARREARS - 1 MINORCONTD FROM 8/13/2012 AND 10/9/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cause Dropped PER ATTORNEY BRUCE E. SOUTH |
|
October 09, 2012 | Hearing |
NP1040 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: ASSIGNED ARREARS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CALENDAR CALL WITH THE DEPARMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES WAS HEARD ON 10/09/2012 AT 2:57 P.M. WITH TUMARA THELEN. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 10/23/2012 AT 8:00 AM IN DIV/DEPT F FOR HEARING ON CAL: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PET) BEFORE THE HON. RALPH MCKNIGHT JR OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. |
|
October 09, 2012 | Hearing |
4106 Order to Show Cause (Pet) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: ASSIGNED ARREARS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 8/13/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.