Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Luque, Maria Teresa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Luque, Joe Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with H. A. Staley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeH. A. Staley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 1988 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2008 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
October 31, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ATTORNEY: RICHARD R. MUIR |
|
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ATTORNEY: RICHARD R. MUIR |
|
September 10, 2008 | Hearing |
180B Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on Amount of $30.00 for LUQUE, MARIA TERESA (PE-1). Received from ATTY RICHARD MUIR, check no(s) 2472. Receipt #409596 for amount of $30.00. |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
180B Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on Amount of $30.00 for LUQUE, MARIA TERESA (PE-1). Received from ATTY RICHARD MUIR, check no(s) 2472. Receipt #409596 for amount of $30.00. |
|
September 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order RE: MILITARY RETIRED PAY JLF |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order RE: MILITARY RETIRED PAY JLF |
|
August 13, 2007 | Hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: COURT ENDORSED COPY OF F&O AFTER HEARING WHO SERVED: LAW OFFICE OF CARL W HART HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 8-18-07 |
|
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: COURT ENDORSED COPY OF F&O AFTER HEARING WHO SERVED: LAW OFFICE OF CARL W HART HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 8-18-07 |
|
August 07, 2007 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 7/16/07 COMMISSIONER COMPTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.