Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lowe, Jillyann, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lowe, Ryan T, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryForeign Support Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Registration of California Support Order FILED BY DCSS |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Registration of California Support Order FILED BY DCSS |
|
January 09, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS: Notice Change/Resp Managing Child Support Case FL-634 SISKIYOU |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Notice Change/Resp Managing Child Support Case FL-634 SISKIYOU |
|
December 11, 2014 | Hearing |
Copies Forwarded to DCSS as Requested ORDER AFTER HEARING FOR 09/15/11 |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copies Forwarded to DCSS as Requested ORDER AFTER HEARING FOR 09/15/11 |
|
October 31, 2011 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing EMPLOYER'S ANSWER TO ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing EMPLOYER'S ANSWER TO ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT |
|
September 15, 2011 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG: 07/19/11 RLM |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG: 07/19/11 RLM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.