Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lopez, Cristobal, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions201 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2359 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
December 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 9/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 9/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 9/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 9/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
September 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) Calendar Notes: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPTCONT'D FROM 6/13/2012 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Case Consolidated CONSOLIDATED WITH FL-604652 (LEAD) |
|
June 13, 2012 | Hearing |
NPCTP105 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE CONTEMPT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH CRISTOBAL LOPEZ (RE-1). DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH ELVIA MACIAS (PO-1). CYNTHIA ESPINOZA APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. CRISTOBAL LOPEZ (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY ELVIA MACIAS. ALSO PRESENT: MARIA SKAGGS, CERTIFIED COURT INTERPRETER.. THE COURT NOTES MR. LOPEZ DECLINES THE ASSISTANCE OF THE SPANISH INTERPRETER. THE COURT ASKS MS. SKAGGS TO REMAIN PRESENT IN CASE HER ASSISTANCE IS NECESSARY. THE COURT FINDS CITEE HAS BEEN INFORMED OF HIS CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS AND HAS MADE A KNOWING, INTELLIGENT AND VOLUNTARY WAIVER OF RIGHTS. CITEE ENTERS A PLEA OF GUILTY AS TO COUNT(S) 1 THROUGH 12. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CITEE SENTENCED TO 3 DAYS PER COUNT, TOTAL OF 36 DAYS JAIL TIME OR 864 HOURS, SENTENCE STAYED PENDING COMPIANCE OF THE FOLLOWING: RESPONDENT TO PAY ONGOING SUPPORT EACH MONTH AND TO PAY $50.00 PER MONTH TOWARD ARREARS COMMENCING 07/01/2012. CAUSE CONTINUED TO THE FOLLOWING HEARING DATES: 09/13/2012, 12/13/2012, 03/13/2013 AND 06/13/2013 AT 8 AM IN DIVISION F. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: FOR COMPLIANCE REVIEW ON CONTEMPT. RESPONDENT IS ORDERED BACK FOR ALL FOUR HEARINGS. FOR EACH HEARING THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION. IF RESPONDENT CONTACTS THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES AND CLEARS HIS APPEARANCE DUE TO WORK THE COURT WILL NOT ISSUE A CIVIL ATTACHMENT ON THOSE HEARING DATES. THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER S-1501-FL-604652 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER S-1501-DA-784899 WITH CASE NUMBER S-1501-FL-604652 BEING THE LEAD CASE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.