Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Owens, Robyn R, Owens, James T, Bryan, Hope, Bryan, William, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph W. Wyatt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2008 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time686 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated receipt of transfer filed ~ calid=1237795 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:06/18/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:gracieg, SystemDate:4/14/2010 9:12:48 AM |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated receipt of transfer filed ~ calid=1237795 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:06/18/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:gracieg, SystemDate:4/14/2010 9:12:48 AM |
|
May 18, 2010 | Hearing |
Receipt for Records Returned RECEIVED FROM: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PROBATE DIVISION |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Records Returned RECEIVED FROM: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PROBATE DIVISION |
|
April 19, 2010 | Hearing |
Certified Mail Claimed COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE PROBATE DIVISION |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Claimed COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE PROBATE DIVISION |
|
April 14, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice of Transfer of Case TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: You are hereby notified that the above entitled matter was transferred to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE on 4/13/2010 . Calendar Notes: TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: You are hereby notified that the above entitled matter was transferred to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE on 4/13/2010 . |
|
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Transfer of Case TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: You are hereby notified that the above entitled matter was transferred to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE on 4/13/2010 . Calendar Notes: TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: You are hereby notified that the above entitled matter was transferred to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE on 4/13/2010 . |
|
April 13, 2010 | Hearing |
Receipt for Records Mailed SHERRI R CARTER SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PROBATE DIVISION 4050 MAIN STREET RIVERSIDE, CA 92501 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET/REGISTER OF ACTIONS AND CHECK #2489 FROM HEATHER J C STANLEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.00 Calendar Notes: SHERRI R CARTER SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PROBATE DIVISION 4050 MAIN STREET RIVERSIDE, CA 92501 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET/REGISTER OF ACTIONS AND CHECK #2489 FROM HEATHER J C STANLEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.00 |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Records Mailed SHERRI R CARTER SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PROBATE DIVISION 4050 MAIN STREET RIVERSIDE, CA 92501 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET/REGISTER OF ACTIONS AND CHECK #2489 FROM HEATHER J C STANLEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.00 Calendar Notes: SHERRI R CARTER SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PROBATE DIVISION 4050 MAIN STREET RIVERSIDE, CA 92501 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET/REGISTER OF ACTIONS AND CHECK #2489 FROM HEATHER J C STANLEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.