Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Littrell, Linda, Brockett, Melissa, Nunlist, Monique, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Judith K. Dulcich presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith K. Dulcich Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2008 |
CategoryProbate/Full Powers |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time4228 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List EXHIBIT DISPOSITION PER ORDER |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order-Destruction of Exhibits 5 YEAR DISPOSITION ORDER Judge: Dulcich, Judith K. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List EXHIBIT DISPOSITION PER ORDER |
|
January 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Order-Destruction of Exhibits 5 YEAR DISPOSITION ORDER Judge: Dulcich, Judith K. |
|
February 04, 2011 | Hearing |
Probate
Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated IN COMPLIANCE - ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED ON 12/16/10. Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1419523] EventCode:4144, CourtDate:02/04/2011, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:10, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:anitah, SystemDate:11/12/2010 5:13:05 PM |
|
January 26, 2011 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated IN COMPLIANCE - ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED ON 12/16/10. Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1419523] EventCode:4144, CourtDate:02/04/2011, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:10, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:anitah, SystemDate:11/12/2010 5:13:05 PM |
|
December 16, 2010 | Hearing |
Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATORS, FOR PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEES, EXTRAORDINARY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION UNDER THE WILL COMMISSIONER RALPH WM. WYAT |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATORS, FOR PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEES, EXTRAORDINARY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION UNDER THE WILL COMMISSIONER RALPH WM. WYAT |
|
November 10, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1191 Department: P Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING - AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATORS, FOR STATUTORY FEES, EXTRAORDINARY ATTORNEYS' FEES. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MONIQUE NUNLIST (PE-1) APPEARS BY STACY H BOWMAN ESQ. MELISSA BROCKETT (PE-2) APPEARS BY STACY H BOWMAN ESQ. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. CAUSE TRAILED TO TO 15:00 P.M. THIS DATE. 15:05 P.M. - CAUSE RESUMES WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS STATED ABOVE. ANITA HAIGHT REPLACES JOCELYN DUNNEGAN AS COURTROOM CLERK. PROBATE NOTES ARE CLEARED. THE COURT NOTES THERE ARE NO OBJECTIONS. THE COURT HAS READ THE PETITION AND SUPPLEMENT, INCORPORATES THE ALLEGATIONS STATED THEREIN AND FINDS THEY ARE TRUE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT GRANTED. REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,863.16 IS APPROVED. REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATOR'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,863.16 IS APPROVED. REQUEST FOR EXTRAORDINARY ATTORNEY'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,950.00 IS APPROVED. STACY BOWMAN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. CAUSE SET FOR COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 02/04/11 AT 9:00 A.M. IN DIVISION P. NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF ORDER IS ON FILE ON OR BEFORE 12/10/10. HEARING TO BE VACATED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.