Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tiller, Dorothy Jean, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph W. Wyatt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2008 |
CategoryProbate/Full Powers |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time986 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2011 | Hearing |
Final Discharge and Order COMMISSIONER: RALPH WM WYATT |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Discharge and Order COMMISSIONER: RALPH WM WYATT |
|
January 06, 2011 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice declaration for final discharge being returned since #2a and #2b are inconsistent. Need to select only one. |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice declaration for final discharge being returned since #2a and #2b are inconsistent. Need to select only one. |
|
July 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting ORDER DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEE AND EXECUTOR'S FEES COMMISSIONER RALPH WM. WYATT |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting ORDER DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEE AND EXECUTOR'S FEES COMMISSIONER RALPH WM. WYATT |
|
July 22, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated order after hearing filed. ~ calid=1271836 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:07/30/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:4, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:anitah, SystemDate:5/26/2010 11:06:17 AM |
|
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated order after hearing filed. ~ calid=1271836 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:07/30/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:4, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:anitah, SystemDate:5/26/2010 11:06:17 AM |
|
May 26, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1191 Department: P Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND FOR EXECUTOR'S FEES AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY ROGER I STEIN ESQ ON BEHALF OF DOROTHY JEAN TILLER (PE-1). PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE COURT NOTES THERE ARE NO OBJECTIONS. THE COURT HAS READ THE PETITION, INCORPORATES THE ALLEGATIONS STATED THEREIN AND FINDS THEY ARE TRUE. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT GRANTED. REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,749.95 IS APPROVED. ROGER STEIN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. CAUSE SET FOR COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 07/30/10 AT 9:00 A.M. IN DIVISION P. NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF ORDER IS ON FILE ON OR BEFORE 06/25/10. HEARING TO BE VACATED. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Hearing |
4044 Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: READY FOR HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.