Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cazares, Daniel, Cazares, Theresa, Fuentes, Erica Q, Fuentes, Martha, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph W. Wyatt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2003 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time3892 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Probate
Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
July 30, 2014 | Hearing | Order Terminating Guardianship (JBSIS) | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Guardianship (JBSIS) | |
July 28, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated IN COMPLIANCE ~ calid=2582617 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:08/26/2014, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, SystemDate:6/17/2014 8:31:53 AM |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated IN COMPLIANCE ~ calid=2582617 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:08/26/2014, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, SystemDate:6/17/2014 8:31:53 AM |
|
June 16, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1085 Department: P Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ERICA Q FUENTES (PE-4) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ALSO PRESENT: THERESA CAZARES. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO ALISA KNIGHT ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP IS GRANTED (J). PARENTAL RIGHTS ARE REINSTATED CAUSE SET FOR COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 8/26/14 AT 9:00 A.M. IN DIV P. NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF ORDER AFTER HEARING IS ON FILE. HEARING TO BE VACATED |
|
June 16, 2014 | Hearing |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: READY FOR HEARING |
|
June 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Review Tentative Ruling: READY FOR HEARING READY FOR HEARING Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: READY FOR HEARING |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: P Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ERICA Q FUENTES (PE-4) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ALSO PRESENT: THERESA CAZARES. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO ALISA KNIGHT ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP IS GRANTED (J). PARENTAL RIGHTS ARE REINSTATED CAUSE SET FOR COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 8/26/14 AT 9:00 A.M. IN DIV P. NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF ORDER AFTER HEARING IS ON FILE. HEARING TO BE VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.