Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Witt, Linda M, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph W. Wyatt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryDecedent Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time4395 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2015 | Hearing |
Order Discharging Administrator for Want of Property Subject to Administration Judge: Wyatt, Ralph W. |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Discharging Administrator for Want of Property Subject to Administration Judge: Wyatt, Ralph W. |
|
December 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Order Discharging Administrator. Returned via AMS bin. |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Order Discharging Administrator. Returned via AMS bin. |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition READY FOR HEARING Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
December 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Petition READY FOR HEARING Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
December 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Declaration to Supplement and Correct Petition for Discharge of Administrator for Want of Property Subject to Administration |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration to Supplement and Correct Petition for Discharge of Administrator for Want of Property Subject to Administration |
|
September 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing 12/3/2015 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 12/3/2015 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.