Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Family Court Services, Fish, Bobbye, Kern County Superior Court, Public Defender, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alisa R. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlisa R. Knight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 1989 |
CategoryConservatorship-Probate |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice of Transfer of Case NOTICE OF TRANSFEERED ACTION |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Transfer of Case NOTICE OF TRANSFEERED ACTION |
|
September 16, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice of Transfer of Case NOTICE OF TRANSFERRED ACTION |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Transfer of Case NOTICE OF TRANSFERRED ACTION |
|
September 12, 2011 | Hearing |
Receipt for Records Returned RECEIVED FROM: SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEXX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA 93408 |
|
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Records Returned RECEIVED FROM: SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEXX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA 93408 |
|
September 06, 2011 | Hearing |
Certified Mail Claimed SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA 93408 |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Claimed SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA 93408 |
|
August 26, 2011 | Hearing |
Receipt for Records Mailed SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA. 93408 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER CHANGING VENUE, CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET, CHECK #1002 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 & CHECK #1510015881 IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00 A TOTAL OF $395.00. MADE PAYABLE TO SAN LUIS PBISPO COURT Calendar Notes: SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA. 93408 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER CHANGING VENUE, CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET, CHECK #1002 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 & CHECK #1510015881 IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00 A TOTAL OF $395.00. MADE PAYABLE TO SAN LUIS PBISPO COURT |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Records Mailed SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA. 93408 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER CHANGING VENUE, CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET, CHECK #1002 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 & CHECK #1510015881 IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00 A TOTAL OF $395.00. MADE PAYABLE TO SAN LUIS PBISPO COURT Calendar Notes: SUPERIOR COURT COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO COURTHOUSE ANNEX 1035 PALM STREET, ROOM 385 SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA. 93408 Dear Sir: Enclosed herewith are the following records in the above-entitled case. Please sign the receipt on the bottom of this form and return it to this office. RE: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER CHANGING VENUE, CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL MINUTE ORDERS, CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET, CHECK #1002 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 & CHECK #1510015881 IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00 A TOTAL OF $395.00. MADE PAYABLE TO SAN LUIS PBISPO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.