Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kern County Superior Court, Hitt, John R, Haefele, Keli A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph W. Wyatt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 1989 |
CategoryDecedent Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Final Discharge and Order COMMISSIONER RALPH WM WYATT |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Discharge and Order COMMISSIONER RALPH WM WYATT |
|
May 14, 2010 | Hearing |
Withdrawal of Creditors Claim CREDITOR: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES AMOUNT: $2,831.77 AND WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Creditors Claim CREDITOR: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES AMOUNT: $2,831.77 AND WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE |
|
March 30, 2010 | Hearing |
Receipt ON DISTRIBUTION |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Receipt ON DISTRIBUTION |
|
March 26, 2010 | Hearing |
4144 Compliance Hearing New Calendar |
|
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
4144 Compliance Hearing New Calendar |
|
March 05, 2010 | Hearing |
Judgment and Order for Final Distribution ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR ADMINISTRATOR, ALLOWING COMPENSATION TO SUCCESSOR ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEY FOR ORDINARY AND EXTRAORDINARY SERVICES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND FOR SURCHARGE OF PRIOR ADMINSITRATOR COMMISSIONER RALPH WM. WYATT |
|
March 05, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL SUBMITTED FOR SIGNATURE 3/5/10. ~ calid=1190382 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:03/26/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:anitah, SystemDate:2/4/2010 3:48:44 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.