Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shadden, Mardi, Witt, Frank K, Witt, Edward A, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alisa R. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlisa R. Knight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 1978 |
CategoryProbate/Full Powers |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2010 | Hearing |
Letters of Administration NAME OF ADMINISTRATOR:MARDI SHADDEN IAEA POWERS:FULL |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letters of Administration NAME OF ADMINISTRATOR:MARDI SHADDEN IAEA POWERS:FULL |
|
May 01, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice LETTERS OF ADMINSTRATION RETURNED TO TIMOTHY L. KLEIER. DATE ON SIGNATURE MISSING. O/B |
|
May 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice LETTERS OF ADMINSTRATION RETURNED TO TIMOTHY L. KLEIER. DATE ON SIGNATURE MISSING. O/B |
|
April 22, 2010 | Hearing |
Order For Probate GENERAL BOND AMOUNT:NONE IAEA POWERS:FULL JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ALISA KNIGHT |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order For Probate GENERAL BOND AMOUNT:NONE IAEA POWERS:FULL JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ALISA KNIGHT |
|
February 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Supplement TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION |
|
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Supplement TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION |
|
February 18, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1301 Department: P Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO REOPEN PROBATE PROCEEDINGS FOR THE PURPOSE OF RECOVERING AND DISTRIBUTING TITLE TO LATER DISCOVERED REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARDI SHADDEN (PE-3) APPEARS BY TIMOTHY L KLEIER ESQ. STIPULATION RE: JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED AND INCORPORATED HEREIN BY REFERENCE. THE COURT NOTE THERE ARE NO OBJECTIONS. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITION GRANTED AS PRAYED. FULL AUTHORITY. NO BOND REQUIRED. TIMOTHY KLEIER TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
February 18, 2010 | Hearing |
4011 Petition Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: READY FOR HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.