Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
A Teichert & Sons Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mcdonough, Erin K, against Reynen & Bardis, Reynen & Bardis Communities Inc. A California Corporation, Reynen & Bardis Construction A California Corporation, represented by Blaine, Carl P, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial488 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time511 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2009 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for A TEICHERT & SONS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from ONE LEGAL LLC, check no(s) 3102614. Receipt #498099 for amount of $20.00. |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for A TEICHERT & SONS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from ONE LEGAL LLC, check no(s) 3102614. Receipt #498099 for amount of $20.00. |
|
November 30, 2009 | Hearing |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
November 20, 2009 | Hearing |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
October 30, 2009 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
July 31, 2009 | Hearing |
Case Consolidated WITH S-1500-CV-263274, S-1500-CV-266092, S-1500-CV-263330; S- 1500-CV-263400; S-1500-CV-263786; S-1500-CV-264231 AND S-1500- CV-263602. THE LEAD CASE IS S-1500-CV-263274. |
|
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated WITH S-1500-CV-263274, S-1500-CV-266092, S-1500-CV-263330; S- 1500-CV-263400; S-1500-CV-263786; S-1500-CV-264231 AND S-1500- CV-263602. THE LEAD CASE IS S-1500-CV-263274. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.