Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Toralba, Lupe, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rice, Linda Fermoyle, against Paik, Young N, represented by Jurich, John A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Palmer, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalmer, William D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
Category45-Cv Medical Malpractice - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial362 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time362 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2009 | Hearing |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
July 17, 2009 | Hearing |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
June 26, 2009 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
June 08, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHN A. JURICH, ESQ |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHN A. JURICH, ESQ |
|
May 29, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED by LINDA FERMOYLE RICE. |
|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED by LINDA FERMOYLE RICE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.