Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Mitchell, John T, against Mendez, Juan Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2008 |
Category07-Cv Business Tort - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions455 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1240 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2011 | Hearing | Abstract - No Fee | |
May 27, 2011 | Hearing | Abstract - No Fee | |
October 26, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1820 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY COUNSEL HAS BEEN REVIEWED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO COUNSEL AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY COUNSEL HAS BEEN REVIEWED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO COUNSEL AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Court THE PEOPLE HAVE AND RECOVER CIVIL PENALTIES FROM DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS MENDEZ IN THE SUM OF $2500.00. DEFENDANTS ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY LIABLE FOR PENALTIES AND RESTITUTION. DEFENDANT BE PERMANENTLY ENJOINED FROM VIOLATING THE PROVISIONS OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTIONS 7028, 7027.1, AND 7159.5 BRUMFIELD |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Court THE PEOPLE HAVE AND RECOVER CIVIL PENALTIES FROM DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS MENDEZ IN THE SUM OF $2500.00. DEFENDANTS ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY LIABLE FOR PENALTIES AND RESTITUTION. DEFENDANT BE PERMANENTLY ENJOINED FROM VIOLATING THE PROVISIONS OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTIONS 7028, 7027.1, AND 7159.5 BRUMFIELD |
|
October 20, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1840 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEFAULT HEARING THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (PL-1) APPEARS BY JOHN T MITCHELL. NO APPEARANCE BY JUAN CARLOS MENDEZ, DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. CAUSE STANDS SUBMITTED. |
|
October 20, 2009 | Hearing |
4004 Default New Calendar |
|
October 20, 2009 | Hearing |
Default PROVE UP HEARING HEARING TRANSFERRED TO DEPT 17; DEPT 14 IS DARK Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
4004 Default New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.