Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davis, Kimberly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Floyd, Jennifer C, against Mai, Cong T, Swift Transportation Co Inc, represented by Watkiins, Norman, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Palmer, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalmer, William D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2008 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial362 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time383 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2009 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
August 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE Personal Injury, Property Damage, Or Wrongful Death filed by JENNIFER C. FLOYD, ESQ |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE Personal Injury, Property Damage, Or Wrongful Death filed by JENNIFER C. FLOYD, ESQ |
|
July 21, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED BY JENNIFER FLOYD. |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED BY JENNIFER FLOYD. |
|
July 20, 2009 | Hearing |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
July 10, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1455 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** PER D-7 CLERK, MATTER HAS SETTLED. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED. |
|
July 10, 2009 | Hearing |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.