Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thurley, Reginald, Thurley, Susan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Floyd, Curtis E, against Torres, Rebecca, Torres, Adan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2009 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2009 | Hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
November 13, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF SUIT. FILED BY KARA L. HITCHCOCK, ESQ |
|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF SUIT. FILED BY KARA L. HITCHCOCK, ESQ |
|
October 30, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 10/15/2008 BY FRANK P SAMPLES, ESQ FOR DEBTOR REBECCA TORRES *************************************************************************************** CASE IS STAYED IN ITS ENTIRETLY BASED ON BANKRUPTCY FILING OF REBECCA TORRES, SUBJECT TO PLAINTIFF OBTAINING RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY STAY, SUCCESSFULLY MOVING TO SEVER PARTY OR DISMISSING ACTION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE A CERTIFICATE OF PROGRES EVERY 90 DAYS RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY COMMENCING 1/20/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/21/2009 VACATED. |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 10/15/2008 BY FRANK P SAMPLES, ESQ FOR DEBTOR REBECCA TORRES *************************************************************************************** CASE IS STAYED IN ITS ENTIRETLY BASED ON BANKRUPTCY FILING OF REBECCA TORRES, SUBJECT TO PLAINTIFF OBTAINING RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY STAY, SUCCESSFULLY MOVING TO SEVER PARTY OR DISMISSING ACTION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE A CERTIFICATE OF PROGRES EVERY 90 DAYS RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY COMMENCING 1/20/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/21/2009 VACATED. |
|
October 15, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY FRANK P. SAMPLES, ESQ |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY FRANK P. SAMPLES, ESQ |
|
October 07, 2008 | Hearing |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
|
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.