Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Seneca One Llc, filed a(n) 43-Cv Other Petition - Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2008 |
Category43-Cv Other Petition - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions462 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time465 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2009 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for SENECA ONE LLC (PE-1). Received from CHRISTOPHER R MILTON, check no(s) 2681. Receipt #488543 for amount of $20.00. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for SENECA ONE LLC (PE-1). Received from CHRISTOPHER R MILTON, check no(s) 2681. Receipt #488543 for amount of $20.00. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Hearing |
Order VACATING ORDER OF FEBRUARY 13, 2009 AND DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETIENNE |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order VACATING ORDER OF FEBRUARY 13, 2009 AND DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETIENNE |
|
October 16, 2009 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing MOTION TO VACATE ORDER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER R. MILTON, ESQ |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing MOTION TO VACATE ORDER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER R. MILTON, ESQ |
|
September 23, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ON MOTION AND ORDER TO VACATE THE 2/13/09 ORDER, FILED 9/18/09: THERE IS A $20.00 FEE FOR THIS ORDER (VIA PRIORITY MAIL LETTER) |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ON MOTION AND ORDER TO VACATE THE 2/13/09 ORDER, FILED 9/18/09: THERE IS A $20.00 FEE FOR THIS ORDER (VIA PRIORITY MAIL LETTER) |
|
February 13, 2009 | Hearing |
Amended Order FIRST AMENDED ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS ETIENNE |
|
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Order FIRST AMENDED ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS ETIENNE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.