Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Burnette Williams, Mary E., Williams, Joseph Troy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kummer, Dixon G, against Burnette Williams, Mary E, represented by Sipes, Michael K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Palmer, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalmer, William D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2008 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial357 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time357 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2009 | Hearing |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
July 01, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY DIXON G. KUMMER, ESQ |
|
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY DIXON G. KUMMER, ESQ |
|
June 26, 2009 | Hearing |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
June 05, 2009 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
June 02, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED by MICHAEL SIPES. |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED by MICHAEL SIPES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.