Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Valdez Family Trust, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Swanson, Jeremy D, against Gomez, Efren J, Leal, Katherine, The Halladay Trust, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2008 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1352 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY PATRICK KAVANAGH, COUNSEL FOR KATHERINE LEAL |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY PATRICK KAVANAGH, COUNSEL FOR KATHERINE LEAL |
|
January 28, 2009 | Hearing |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for THE VALDEZ FAMILY TRUST (PL-1). Received from JEREMY D SWANSON, check no(s) 10640. Receipt #435248 for amount of $15.00. |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for THE VALDEZ FAMILY TRUST (PL-1). Received from JEREMY D SWANSON, check no(s) 10640. Receipt #435248 for amount of $15.00. |
|
January 27, 2009 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
January 12, 2009 | Hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
December 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Court JUDGMENT FOR: THE VALDEZ FAMILY TRUST JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE HALLADAY TRUST, KATHERINE LEAL, EFREN J GOMEZ DAMAGES: 50,800.00 INTEREST: 15,240.00 ATTORNEY FEES: 1,000.00 COSTS: 434.00 TOTAL: 67,474.00 JUDGE CHAPIN DATE RECORDED: 12/5/08 DOC #2 PGS: 2 |
|
December 05, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1840 /PROVE-UP HEARING. Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEFAULT HEARING /PROVE-UP HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: THE VALDEZ FAMILY TRUST (PL-1) APPEARS BY JEREMY D SWANSON ESQ. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, THE VALDEZ FAMILY TRUST AGAINST DEFENDANTS. JUDGMENT EXECUTED THIS DATE. |
|
December 05, 2008 | Hearing |
4004 Default New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.