Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Miscellaneous-Civil (Bcm) case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2008 |
CategoryMiscellaneous-Civil (Bcm) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2009 | Hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
December 19, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION FILED 11/21/2008 BY ATTORNEY LEONARD C. HERR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS' *************************************************************************************** HAVING ACTION BEEN REMOVED TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT, THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS CLASSIFIED "OUT OF COURT'S CONTROL" CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/12/2009 IS VACATED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION FILED 11/21/2008 BY ATTORNEY LEONARD C. HERR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS' *************************************************************************************** HAVING ACTION BEEN REMOVED TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT, THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS CLASSIFIED "OUT OF COURT'S CONTROL" CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/12/2009 IS VACATED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
November 21, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Removal of Action FILED IN THE UNITED STATE DISTRICT COURT FILED BY LEONARD C. HERR, ESQ |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal of Action FILED IN THE UNITED STATE DISTRICT COURT FILED BY LEONARD C. HERR, ESQ |
|
November 17, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1820 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE ORDER ISSUED ON NOVEMBER 13, 2008, REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE, IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. THE CASE IS REINSTATED TO THE CIVIL ACTIVE LIST AND IS TO PROCEED WITH THE PREVIOUSLY NOTICED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING IS SET FOR JANUARY 12, 2009 AT 8:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 4. COUNSEL IS IN COMPLIANCE. SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2008 IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 HAVE BEEN RECEIVED BY THE COURT AS OF NOVEMBER 03, 2008. PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS' HAVE BEEN FILED AS OF OCTOBER 31, 2008 COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE ORDER ISSUED ON NOVEMBER 13, 2008, REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE, IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. THE CASE IS REINSTATED TO THE CIVIL ACTIVE LIST AND IS TO PROCEED WITH THE PREVIOUSLY NOTICED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING IS SET FOR JANUARY 12, 2009 AT 8:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 4. COUNSEL IS IN COMPLIANCE. SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2008 IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 HAVE BEEN RECEIVED BY THE COURT AS OF NOVEMBER 03, 2008. PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS' HAVE BEEN FILED AS OF OCTOBER 31, 2008 COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
November 13, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.110. (CONTINUED FROM 09/29/08) THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL OF RECORD, WILLIAM A. ROMAINE. *************************************************************************************** NO APPEARANCES. NO PROOF OF SERVICE, CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS OR WRITTEN OPPOSITION FILED WITH THE COURT. CASE DISMISSED ENTIRELY, WITH PREJUDICE. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
November 13, 2008 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.