Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Financial Credit Network Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gubler, E Warren, against Carreno, Maria Eutimia, Carreno, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
Category09-Cv Other Collections-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3987 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned with Service | |
February 07, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Renewal of Judgment | |
February 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Application for Renewal of Judgment Judgment For: Judgment Against: Total Judgment (Original): $ Costs After Judgment: $ Credits After Judgment: $ Interest After Judgment: $ Fee for Filing Renewal Application: $ Total Renewed Judgment: $ |
|
February 07, 2019 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
February 07, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application for Renewal of Judgment Judgment For: Judgment Against: Total Judgment (Original): $ Costs After Judgment: $ Credits After Judgment: $ Interest After Judgment: $ Fee for Filing Renewal Application: $ Total Renewed Judgment: $ |
|
February 18, 2011 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
February 09, 2011 | Hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK INC (PL-1). Received from FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK INC., check no(s) 19716. Receipt #572947 for amount of $25.00. |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK INC (PL-1). Received from FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK INC., check no(s) 19716. Receipt #572947 for amount of $25.00. |
|
February 17, 2009 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK INC (PL-1). Received from GUBLER KOCH DEGN & GOMEZ LLP, check no(s) 18031. Receipt #438969 for amount of $20.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.