Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ayyoub, Doreen Badi, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Perez, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1620 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF FRANK PEREZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. OUT OF COURT RULING/ORDER: PLAINTIFF MAY REAPPLY FOR RESTRAINING ORDER IF ANY FURTHER CONDUCT BY DEFENDANT. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION |
|
April 14, 2008 | Hearing |
4072 OSC/Petition re: Harassment New Calendar |
|
April 14, 2008 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause NO TEMPORARY ORDERS NO PROOF Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
4072 OSC/Petition re: Harassment New Calendar |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1620 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF FRANK PEREZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. OUT OF COURT RULING/ORDER: PLAINTIFF MAY REAPPLY FOR RESTRAINING ORDER IF ANY FURTHER CONDUCT BY DEFENDANT. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NO TEMPORARY ORDERS NO PROOF Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
April 11, 2008 | Hearing | Response to Temporary Restraining Order | |
April 11, 2008 | Hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: HOW CAN I ANSWER A REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT, ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING & TRO, REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT, ATTACHMENTS, PROOF OF FIREARMS WHO SERVED: FRANK PEREZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 04/03/2008 |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: HOW CAN I ANSWER A REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT, ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING & TRO, REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP HARASSMENT, ATTACHMENTS, PROOF OF FIREARMS WHO SERVED: FRANK PEREZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 04/03/2008 |
|
March 28, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) SET FOR: APRIL 14, 2008@ 8:30AM IN D-17 NO TEMPORARY ORDERS GRANTED LAE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.