Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Contractors Indemnity Company, filed a(n) 16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited case represented by Pagter, R Gibson, Jr., against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For Morgan Stanley Abs Capital 1, Recontrust Company, N.A, Scott, Sherryl Rae, represented by Brooks, David A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Palmer, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalmer, William D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
Category16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time382 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2008 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
December 21, 2007 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) AS TO DEUTSCH BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND RECONTRUST COMPANY ONLY WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR |
|
December 21, 2007 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) AS TO SHERRYL RAE SCOTT ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) AS TO DEUTSCH BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND RECONTRUST COMPANY ONLY WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) AS TO SHERRYL RAE SCOTT ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR |
|
November 28, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1435 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR ON BEHALF OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (PL-1). APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR ON BEHALF OF SHERRYL RAE SCOTT (DE-1). APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY R GIBSON PAGTER JR FOR DAVID BROOKS ON BEHALF OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL 1 INC. TRUST 2006-NC5 (DE-4). *************************************************************************************** CAUSE REPORTED SETTLED. COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISS ACTION IN ENTIRETY BY 1/8/2008. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 1/15/2008 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
November 28, 2007 | Hearing |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
November 28, 2007 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference CONT'D FROM 10/25/07 Judge: Palmer, William D. |
|
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.